CA AB805 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-11 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-11 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 977, 977.5, and 984.5 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Unemployment insurance: contribution rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 805 Obernolte Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1361.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 977 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 977.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 984.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |