CA AB806 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 163, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 66025.9, 67003.5, 69514.5, 69561, and 76300 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Postsecondary education: homeless and former homeless youth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-11 - Senate - Special Consent AB806 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 806 Bloom Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-31 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 163, Statutes of 2019.
2019-07-31 Approved by the Governor.
2019-07-23AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
2019-07-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-07-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2056.).
2019-07-03SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-06-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
2019-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-05-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1590.)
2019-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1).
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2019-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback