CA AB814 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 16, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 16, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 502 of the Penal Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: unlawful access to computer systems.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB814 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 814 Chau Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 814 Chau Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 16, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-06-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1606.). |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1473.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and PUB. S. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |