CA AB819 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 777, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 777, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1506.1, 1507.25, 1517, 1517.5, 1522, 1522.1, 1527, 1527.1, 1527.2, 1527.4, 1527.5, 1558, 1562.02, 1568.092, 1569.58, and 1596.8897 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 11172 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 366.3, 11405, 11461, 11462, 11463, 16519.5, 16519.58, 18360.05, and 18360.15 of, and to add Sections 727.05, 16501.95, and 18360.20 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.
Title
Foster care.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 819 Mark Stone Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB819 Mark Stone By Hurtado (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 819 Mark Stone Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB819 Mark Stone By Hurtado (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 819 Mark Stone Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 777, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3288.). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.) |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2687.). |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and PUB. S. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1590.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |