CA AB838 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 208, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 208, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65865.5, 65962, and 66474.5 of, and to add Section 65962.1 to, the Government Code, relating to flood management.
Title
Flood management: Mossdale Tract.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 838 Eggman Concurrence in Senate Amendments By CALDERON (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB838 Eggman et al. By Galgiani (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 838 Eggman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB838 Eggman et al. By Galgiani (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 838 Eggman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 208, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5480.). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to the unfinished business file. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4355.). |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 5). |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3904.) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3893.) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 23). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65865.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65962 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65962.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 66474.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |