CA AB841 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21608.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to junk dealers and recyclers.
Title
Junk dealers and recyclers: nonferrous materials: payment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB841 Torres By Torres (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Assembly - AB 841 TORRES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Assembly - AB 841 TORRES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2014-01-06 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2013-10-03 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 1988.). |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 1005.) |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 16). |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 21608.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |