CA AB841 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 843, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 843, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 49431.9 to the Education Code, relating to pupil nutrition.
Title
Pupil nutrition: food and beverages: advertising: corporate incentive programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 841 WEBER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB841 Weber et al. By Monning (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 841 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 29 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB841 Weber et al. By Monning (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 841 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 29 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 843, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3099.). |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2457.). |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 29. Page 1900.) |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 10). |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49431.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49431.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |