CA AB870 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-21 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-21 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1203.096 of the Penal Code, relating to prisoners.
Title
Prisoners: mental health treatment.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Assembly - AB 870 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-04 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Assembly - AB 870 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-04 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 3780.) |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 9). |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 4). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 21671 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1203.096 | Amended Code | Citation Text |