CA AB874 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-29 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-29 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 115800 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to recreational activities.
Title
Recreational activities: skateboarding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-04 - Assembly - AB 874 SALDANA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-05-04 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-04 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1222.) | |
2009-04-23 | From Consent Calendar. To third reading. | |
2009-04-22 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-04-21 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (April 14). | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-02-27 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |