CA AB892 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 310, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 310, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1088, 1101.4, 1102, 1102.2, 1102.3, 1102.6, 1103.1, 2079, 2079.13, and 2079.14 of the Civil Code, relating to real property.
Title
Transfers of real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-05 - Assembly - AB 892 Holden Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB892 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 892 Holden Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB892 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 892 Holden Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 310, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3008.). |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2291.). |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Measure version as amended on July 1 corrected. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1770.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1088 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1101.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1102.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1102.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1102.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1103.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2079 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2079.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2079.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |