CA AB9 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 12960 of the Government Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment discrimination: limitation of actions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 9 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 5. Page 1863.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (May 16).
2019-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-01-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2018-12-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
2018-12-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12960Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback