CA AB90 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 17, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 75230 of the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 99268.9, 99312.1, and 99314.6 of, and to add Section 99314.10 to, the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Section 6592 of, and to add Sections 6452.05 and 6591.3 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - Assembly - AB 90 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB90 BUDGET (Ting) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 90 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 17, Statutes of 2020.
2020-06-29 Approved by the Governor.
2020-06-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 6:30 p.m.
2020-06-26AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 17.).
2020-06-26AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 16.)
2020-06-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2020-06-25SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 11.).
2020-06-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 24).
2020-06-22SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-06-26SenateRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-06-19SenateOrdered to third reading.
2019-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2019-06-17SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-06-12SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-11SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-06-10SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-04-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1172.)
2019-04-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-04AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-04AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-04-04AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.)
2019-01-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-12-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
2018-12-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback