CA AB904 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 63, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 63, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1534 of the Penal Code, relating to search warrants.
Title
Search warrants: tracking devices.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 904 Chau Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB904 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 904 Chau Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB904 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 904 Chau Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 63, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5351.). |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4373.). |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 31). |
2020-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3888.) |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 14). |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P.) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3769.) |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1534 | Amended Code | Citation Text |