CA AB916 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-01 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-01 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 3.3 (commencing with Section 105230) to Part 5 of Division 103 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to pesticides.
Title
Pesticide use: glyphosate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 916 Muratsuchi Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on AGRI. and EQ. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1361.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 105230 | New Code | See Bill Text |