CA AB92 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 18, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 18, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19620.15 of the Business and Professions Code, to add Part 4 (commencing with Section 19700) to Division 9 of the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Section 8878.109 of the Government Code, to amend Section 25215.5 of the Health and Safety Code, to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 4810) to Part 2.5 of Division 4 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Sections 1525, 1552, 12879.7, and 13160 of the Water Code, relating to public resources, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public resources: omnibus trailer bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Assembly - AB 92 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB92 BUDGET (Ting) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 92 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB92 BUDGET (Ting) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 92 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 18, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-06-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6:30 p.m. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 4962.). |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 4954.) |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 3854.). |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 7.) (June 24). |
2020-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1173.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19620.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 19700 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8878.109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25215.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4810 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 12879.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 13160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 1525 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 1552 | Amended Code | Citation Text |