CA AB925 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-19 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 527.6 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Section 6301.5 of the Family Code, relating to protective orders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protective orders: confidential information regarding minors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 925 Gloria Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-15SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-07-05SenateOrdered to third reading.
2019-07-05SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2019-07-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-07-01SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-10SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-29SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-05-23SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-08SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-04-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1362.)
2019-04-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2019-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-28AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-03-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 26).
2019-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2019-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure527.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Family Code6301.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback