CA AB933 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 23582.5 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: 24/7 Sobriety programs.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 933 FRAZIER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Insurance to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 933 FRAZIER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Insurance to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wieckowski. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2015-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1452.) |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and INS. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 1808 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23582.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |