CA AB943 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 515, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 515, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 78220 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: Student Equity and Achievement Program funds.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] |
Asm. Randy Voepel [R] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB943 Chiu et al. By Wilk (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Result (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 943 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Result (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 943 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 515, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2516.). |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1622.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1584.) |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 2). |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 78220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |