CA AB953 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65852.2 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Land use: accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - Assembly - AB 953 Ting Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Housing and Community Development] and [Local Government] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Housing and Community Development] and [Local Government] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3942.) |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23). |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3769.) |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 6). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and REV. & TAX. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65852.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |