CA AB957 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 620, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 620, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65583.2 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 17980.7, 53590, 53591, 53592, 53593, 53594, and 53595 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 5849.35 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to housing, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Housing Omnibus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 957 H. & C.D. Concurrence - Urgency Added By CHIU (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB957 H. & C.D. (Chiu) By Wiener Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 957 H. & C.D. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB957 H. & C.D. (Chiu) By Wiener Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 957 H. & C.D. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 620, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3090.). |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2286.). |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1770.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65583.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 17980.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53590 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53591 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53592 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53593 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53594 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53595 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5849.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |