CA AB96 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 41017, 41031, 41032, 41040, 41051, 41053, 41055, 41056, 41075, 41100, 41129, 41130, 41135, 41136, 41137, 41140, and 41150 of, to amend the heading of Article 2 (commencing with Section 41030) of Chapter 2 of Part 20 of Division 2 of, to amend and repeal Section 41025 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 41007, 41009, 41016.5, 41020, and 41046 of, to add Sections 41007.1, 41007.2, 41007.3, 41007.4, 41007.5, and 41028 to, to repeal Section 41033 of, and to repeal and add Sections 41004 and 41030 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Emergency Telephone Users Surcharge Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 96 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 96 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (June 12). |
2019-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1175.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |