CA AB967 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 846, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 846, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 7611.9, 7672, 7672.1, 7672.2, 7672.3, 7672.4, 7672.6, 7672.7, 7673.1, and 7685.2 of, to add Sections 7611.12, 7653.35, 7653.36, 7712.11, and 7730.11 to, and to add Article 2.7 (commencing with Section 7639) to Chapter 12 of Division 3 of, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 7003, 7010.3, 7010.7, 7011, 7011.2, 7015, 7016, 7051, 7051.5, 7052, 7052.5, 7054, 7054.1, 7054.6, 7055, 7116, 7117, 103055, 103060, and 103080 of, to add Sections 7002.5, 7006.1, 7006.4, 7006.6, 7006.8, 7010.1, 7017, and 7054.8 to, and to add Article 8 (commencing with Section 8370) to Chapter 2 of Part 3 of Division 8 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to disposal of human remains, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Human remains disposal: alkaline hydrolysis: licensure and regulation.
Sponsors
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-16 - Assembly - AB 967 GLORIA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB967 Gloria By Hill (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Noes: (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 967 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB967 Gloria By Hill (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Noes: (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 967 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 846, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-16 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 6. Page 3542.). |
2017-09-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3535.) |
2017-09-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 3002.). |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Joint Rule 61(a)(14) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2737.) |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 21). |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and EQ. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 3. Page 1965.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (May 26). |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 25). |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |