CA AB97 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 40, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 40, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 26040, 26043, 26050.2, 26055, 26062, 26062.5, 26210, 26240, 26242, 26244, 26246, and 26248 of, and to add Section 26031.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 11126 of the Government Code, and to add Section 34019.5 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to cannabis, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Assembly - AB 97 BUDGET Concurrence - Urgency Added By TING (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB97 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell Urgency Clause (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 97 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB97 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell Urgency Clause (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 97 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 40, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 11. Page 2452.). |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 1722.). |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 12). |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1176.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26031.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26040 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26043 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26050.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26055 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26062 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26062.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26240 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26242 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26244 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26246 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26248 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11126 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 34019.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |