CA AB979 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 4432.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 4432.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 301.3 of, and to add Sections 301.4 and 2115.6 to, the Corporations Code, relating to corporations.
Title
Corporations: boards of directors: underrepresented communities.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] |
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 979 Holden Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB979 Holden et al. By Hueso (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 979 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB979 Holden et al. By Hueso (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 979 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-29 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 4432.). | |
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 316, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 8. Page 5377.). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5274.) |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 8.). |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 20). |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2020-07-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2020-07-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3894.) |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 23). |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 2115.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Corporations Code | 301.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 301.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |