CA AB984 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 445, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 445, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 26 (commencing with Section 18914) of Chapter 3 of Part 10.2 of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Personal income taxes: voluntary contributions: Suicide Prevention Voluntary Tax Contribution Fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Sen. Steve Glazer [D] |
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-22 - Assembly - AB 984 Lackey Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB984 Lackey et al. By Portantino (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 984 Lackey Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB984 Lackey et al. By Portantino (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 984 Lackey Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 445, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2797.). |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2204.). |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 12). |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1590.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18914 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |