CA AB997 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8102 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: persons detained or apprehended for examination of mental condition.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |