CA ACA23 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Referred to Com. on G.O.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Referred to Com. on G.O.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 19 of Article IV thereof, relating to the lottery.
Title
Lottery prizes: personal income tax.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200ACA23 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200ACA23 |