CA ACA3 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by adding Section 8 to Article X thereof, relating to water.
Title
Clean Water for All Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Sen. Andreas Borgeas [R] | Sen. Ling Ling Chang [R] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on March 20 corrected. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |