CA ACA6 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Sections 2 and 4 of Article II thereof, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: disqualification of electors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACA6 McCarty et al. By Bradford (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - ACA 6 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - ACA 6 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2020. |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. |
2020-06-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 3816.) |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 23). |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 3799.) |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 54. Noes 19. Page 3050.) |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (July 10). |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |