CA ACR104 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-15-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-15-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Philippine Independence Day.
Title
Philippine Independence Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent ACR104 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - ACR 104 Bonta Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - ACR 104 Bonta Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-27 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2245.) |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2458.) |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |