CA ACR130 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-4)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to African descendants of slaves in the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

African descendants of slaves in the United States.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR130 Weber et al. By Bradford (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-26AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-26AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2019-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-09-09SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2703.)
2019-09-04SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-03SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-08-30AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 2887.)
2019-08-30AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2019-08-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-08-20AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-08-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback