CA ACR153 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Engineers Week.
Title
Engineers Week.
Sponsors
Asm. Luz Rivas [D] | Asm. Kansen Chu [D] | Asm. Jay Obernolte [R] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Senate - Special Consent ACR153 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Assembly - ACR 153 Luz Rivas Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Assembly - ACR 153 Luz Rivas Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2020. |
2020-06-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3686.) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 4046.) |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 6). |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | From printer. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |