CA ACR173 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-7)
Status: Passed on September 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Native Plant Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Native Plant Week.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR173 Evans By Wolk (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-14 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2010.
2010-09-14 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m.
2010-08-30 In Assembly. To enrollment.
2010-08-27 Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4974.)
2010-08-25 Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
2010-08-03 In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2010-08-02 Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 6000.)
2010-06-28 From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 28).
2010-06-23 Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
2010-06-22 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended.
2010-06-10 Referred to Com. on RULES.
2010-06-04 From printer.
2010-06-03 Introduced. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=acr_173&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/acr_173_bill_20100603_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/acr_173_bill_20100622_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/acr_173_bill_20100802_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/acr_173_bill_20100910_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/acr_173_bill_20100914_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/acr_173_vote_20100628_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/acr_173_vote_20100827_0131PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback