CA ACR173 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-6)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 184, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Joe Gatto Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joe Gatto Memorial Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 1 ACR173 Gomez By De Le (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Assembly - ACR 173 GOMEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-11AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 184, Statutes of 2014.
2014-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
2014-08-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2014-08-29SenateFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on third reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. Ordered to third reading. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4978.)
2014-08-28SenatePursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Page 4952.)
2014-08-22SenateRe-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2014-08-21SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2014-08-21AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6303.)
2014-08-19AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 19).
2014-08-18AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-08-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2014-08-12AssemblyFrom printer.
2014-08-11AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=acr_173&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/acr_173_bill_20140811_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/acr_173_bill_20140904_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/acr_173_bill_20140911_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/acr_173_vote_20140818_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/acr_173_vote_20140819_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/acr_173_vote_20140821_1157AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/acr_173_vote_20140829_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/acr_173_vote_20140829_0426PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback