CA ACR173 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-27)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness Month and The Longest Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness Month and The Longest

Sponsors

Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Cheryl Brown [D]Sen. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. K H Achadjian [R]Asm. Luis Alejo [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Sen. Toni Atkins [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Susan Bonilla [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]
Asm. Nora Campos [D]Sen. Ling Ling Chang [R]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Matt Dababneh [D]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Sen. Bill Dodd [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]
Asm. Beth Gaines [R]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gatto [D]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Richard Gordon [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Sen. Shannon Grove [R]Asm. David Hadley [R]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Sen. Brian Jones [R]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Young Kim [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Eric Linder [R]
Asm. Patty Lopez [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Sen. Melissa Melendez [R]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Kristin Olsen [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Sebastian Ridley-Thomas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Donald Wagner [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Sen. Scott Wilk [R]Asm. Das Williams [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR173 Cooley By McGuire (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-19AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2016.
2016-08-19AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
2016-08-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2016-08-15SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4985.)
2016-06-21SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2016-06-20SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2016-06-16AssemblyAmended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5399.)
2016-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 23).
2016-04-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2016-04-20AssemblyFrom printer.
2016-04-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback