CA ACR177 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-17-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Family Justice Centers.
Title
Family Justice Centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4255.) |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 2). |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |