CA ACR178 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-14-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-14-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to School Breakfast Week.
Title
School Breakfast Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - Senate - Special Consent ACR178 Blanca Rubio et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2020. |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3749.) |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4229.) |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 27). |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |