CA ACR61 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-17-1)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 165, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-17-1)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 165, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Gold Star Mothers’ and Families’ Day.
Title
Gold Star Mothers’ and Families’ Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR61 Salas et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Assembly - ACR 61 Salas Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Assembly - ACR 61 Salas Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 165, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2715.) |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2848.) |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |