CA ACR64 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-4)
Status: Passed on September 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-4)
Status: Passed on September 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to postsecondary education.
Title
California State University and University of California: SAT and ACT.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR64 McCarty et al. By Glazer (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 2576.) |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2220.) |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Amended. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |