CA ACR81 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-13-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 85, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-13-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 85, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Fishing and Boating Week.
Title
California Fishing and Boating Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR81 Gipson et al. By McGuire (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 85, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1474.) |
2019-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2174.) |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 24). |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |