CA ACR87 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-16-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-04 - Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-04 - Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to civic education in public schools.
Title
Upholding democracy through civic education in public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Amend, and be adopted as amended and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Amend, and be adopted as amended and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2840.) |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Amended. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-03 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |