CA ACR94 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-14)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 126, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to public health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Inflammatory Breast Cancer Awareness Day of 2019.

Sponsors

Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]
Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]
Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Asm. Tyler Diep [R]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]
Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR94 Reyes et al. By Leyva (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - ACR 94 Reyes Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-16AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 126, Statutes of 2019.
2019-08-16AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2019-08-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-08-12SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2139.)
2019-07-03SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-24SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-06-20AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 2372.)
2019-06-20AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13).
2019-05-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-05-15AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-05-14AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback