CA ACR98 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-14-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to mental health and substance use treatment.
Title
Mental health and substance use treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-26 - Assembly - ACR 98 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2842.) |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |