CA ACR99 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 69-2)
Status: Enrolled on September 9 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 11.).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to civil rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil rights: lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, or queer people.

Sponsors

Asm. Evan Low [D]Sen. Toni Atkins [D]Sen. Jim Beall [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D]
Sen. Mike McGuire [D]Sen. Richard Pan [D]Sen. Anthony Portantino [D]Sen. Henry Stern [D]
Sen. Tom Umberg [D]Asm. Bob Wieckowski [D]Sen. Scott Wiener [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]
Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - Assembly - ACR 99 Low Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR99 Low et al. By Umberg (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - Senate - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 11.).
2019-09-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2019-09-04SenateAdopted and to Assembly.
2019-08-28SenateAmended. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-27SenateFrom committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (August 27).
2019-07-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-06-25SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-06-24AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 2395.)
2019-06-24AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-06-24AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 2390.)
2019-06-24AssemblyAmended. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 18).
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-06-05AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-06-04AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback