CA AJR11 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to immigration.
Title
Immigration: Development, Relief, and Education for Alien Minors Act: Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals: Deferred Enforced Departure: Temporary Protected Status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-22 - Assembly - AJR 11 Carrillo Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR11 Carrillo et al. By Caballero (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - AJR 11 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR11 Carrillo et al. By Caballero (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - AJR 11 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-27 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 2790.). |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 2179.) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 11). |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 1726.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |