CA AJR17 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-18-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-11 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-11 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to missing and murdered Native American women and girls.
Title
Missing and murdered Native American women and girls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - AJR 17 Ramos Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3249.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 74(d) suspended. (Page 3090.) |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-12 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |