CA AJR20 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-19-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-21 - Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-21 - Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Hmong veterans.
Title
State veterans cemeteries: Hmong veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-12 - Assembly - AJR 20 Patterson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2662.) |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |