CA AJR7 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-04 - Measure version as revised on September 3 corrected.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Green New Deal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Green New Deal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-03 - Assembly - AJR 7 Gloria Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-04SenateMeasure version as revised on September 3 corrected.
2019-09-04SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-09-03AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 15. Page 2947.)
2019-09-03AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-07-09AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 8).
2019-07-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-07-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Amended.
2019-04-29AssemblyIn committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author.
2019-03-12AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-02-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-02-12AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-02-11AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback