CA AR105 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-27 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 60. Noes 3. Page 5252.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-27 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 60. Noes 3. Page 5252.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to vote by mail and the November 3, 2020, general election.
Title
Relative to vote by mail and the November 3, 2020, general election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Assembly - HR 105 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 60. Noes 3. Page 5252.). |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 74(d) suspended. (Page 5250.) |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Introduced. |