CA AR28 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-18-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Read. Adopted. (Page 1188.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-18-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Read. Adopted. (Page 1188.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Cambodian Genocide Memorial Week.
Title
Relative to Cambodian Genocide Memorial Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 1188.). |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Introduced. |